IN HB1488 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 262
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rehabilitation and community based services. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services (division) to develop a plan to establish a statewide crisis assistance system program for individuals with developmental disabilities and sets forth requirements of the program. Establishes a task force until December 31, 2025, for assessment of services and supports for people with intellectual and other developmental disabilities (task force). Provides that the task force shall meet twice a year to receive a report from the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) on the implementation of the comprehensive plan of implementation of community based services provided to people with intellectual and other developmental disabilities (implementation plan). Provides that: (1) at the first annual meeting, the office shall report on the progress made in implementing each recommendation of the implementation plan; and (2) at the second annual meeting, the office shall report any legislative changes needed to implement any recommendation of the implementation plan. Requires the division to determine and assess certain components of the vocational rehabilitation services program and serve specified individuals upon determining sufficient staffing and financial resources. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services, in coordination with the task force, to establish new priority categories for individuals served by a waiver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rehabilitation and community based services. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services (division) to develop a plan to establish a statewide crisis assistance system program for individuals with developmental disabilities and sets forth requirements of the program. Establishes a task force until December 31, 2025, for assessment of services and supports for people with intellectual and other developmental disabilities (task force). Provides that the task force shall meet twice a year to receive a report from the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) on the implementation of the comprehensive plan of implementation of community based services provided to people with intellectual and other developmental disabilities (implementation plan). Provides that: (1) at the first annual meeting, the office shall report on the progress made in implementing each recommendation of the implementation plan; and (2) at the second annual meeting, the office shall report any legislative changes needed to implement any recommendation of the implementation plan. Requires the division to determine and assess certain components of the vocational rehabilitation services program and serve specified individuals upon determining sufficient staffing and financial resources. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services, in coordination with the task force, to establish new priority categories for individuals served by a waiver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 262
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 582: yeas 85, nays 0
2019-04-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 430: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseRepresentative Stutzman added as coauthor
2019-02-19HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-02-19HouseCosponsor: Senator Breaux
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus, Charbonneau and Grooms
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 94, nays 1
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Mayfield added as coauthor
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-16HouseCoauthored by Representatives Karickhoff and Porter
2019-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1488/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/9/b/079b32c0/HB1488.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/a/7/7ba72747/HB1488.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/3/c/133c606a/HB1488.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/3/9/bb399ae1/HB1488.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/5/d/a35d6175/HB1488.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/1/b/561b0377/HB1488.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/4/d/964da445/HB1488.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/3/5/cd35c7ff/HB1488.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/c/6/05c6915d/HB1488.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/2/0/4920d46d/HB1488.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/f/8/3df833ad/HB1488.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/a/1/78a1245a/HB1488.237.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/3/d/d23d367a/HB1488.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/5/5/7755cf72/HB1488.430.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/6/a/5f6a8fcd/HB1488.582.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback