IN HB1437 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Training for local government officers. Adds a definition of "training course" for purposes of the training requirements that are applicable to the executive, legislative, and fiscal bodies of counties, cities and towns. Requires the Indiana office of community and rural affairs (office) to develop and make available courses to train members of the following county, city, and town bodies: (1) A plan commission and board of zoning appeals. (2) A county drainage board. Provides that the office may work in cooperation with public and private organizations and state educational institutions in developing and making the training courses available. Requires a member of a county, city, or town body to complete the training by the later of the following dates: (1) Twelve months after the member is elected or appointed. (2) July 1, 2020. Allows a county, city, or town to fix the compensation of a building inspector that has attained certification from the International Code Council at a salary that is higher than a building inspector that has not attained certification. Provides that an individual elected to the office of county auditor, treasurer, recorder, or surveyor must take a newly elected official training course before the individual first takes the office. Provides that money in the county elected officials training fund (fund) may be used to provide to county auditors, treasurers, recorders, and surveyors the following: (1) Travel, lodging, and related expenses associated with any training paid for from the fund. (2) Training of one or more designees of a county elected official if sufficient funds are appropriated by the county fiscal body. Provides that money in the fund may be used for the newly elected official training course expenses. Provides that the failure of an individual to complete the required training does not prevent the individual from taking an office to which the individual was elected. Provides that a county, city, or town may pay the training expenses of a member of the executive, legislative, or fiscal body from the county, city, or town's general fund without appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Training for local government officers. Adds a definition of "training course" for purposes of the training requirements that are applicable to the executive, legislative, and fiscal bodies of counties, cities and towns. Requires the Indiana office of community and rural affairs (office) to develop and make available courses to train members of the following county, city, and town bodies: (1) A plan commission and board of zoning appeals. (2) A county drainage board. Provides that the office may work in cooperation with public and private organizations and state educational institutions in developing and making the training courses available. Requires a member of a county, city, or town body to complete the training by the later of the following dates: (1) Twelve months after the member is elected or appointed. (2) July 1, 2020. Allows a county, city, or town to fix the compensation of a building inspector that has attained certification from the International Code Council at a salary that is higher than a building inspector that has not attained certification. Provides that an individual elected to the office of county auditor, treasurer, recorder, or surveyor must take a newly elected official training course before the individual first takes the office. Provides that money in the county elected officials training fund (fund) may be used to provide to county auditors, treasurers, recorders, and surveyors the following: (1) Travel, lodging, and related expenses associated with any training paid for from the fund. (2) Training of one or more designees of a county elected official if sufficient funds are appropriated by the county fiscal body. Provides that money in the fund may be used for the newly elected official training course expenses. Provides that the failure of an individual to complete the required training does not prevent the individual from taking an office to which the individual was elected. Provides that a county, city, or town may pay the training expenses of a member of the executive, legislative, or fiscal body from the county, city, or town's general fund without appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseRepresentative Goodin added as coauthor
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Garten
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-02-11HouseRepresentative May added as coauthor
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2019-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Engleman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback