IN HB1400 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education studies. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on education during the 2019 through 2022 interims the following: (1) The study of how to: (A) eliminate, reduce, or streamline the number of education mandates placed on schools; and (B) streamline fiscal and compliance reporting to the general assembly on a sustainable and systematic basis. (2) The review of certain provisions relating to professional development, development of policies, reporting requirements, and curriculum requirements of schools. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on education the task of studying in the 2019 interim the cost and benefits of virtual schools in relation to public school corporations and public school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education studies. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on education during the 2019 through 2022 interims the following: (1) The study of how to: (A) eliminate, reduce, or streamline the number of education mandates placed on schools; and (B) streamline fiscal and compliance reporting to the general assembly on a sustainable and systematic basis. (2) The review of certain provisions relating to professional development, development of policies, reporting requirements, and curriculum requirements of schools. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on education the task of studying in the 2019 interim the cost and benefits of virtual schools in relation to public school corporations and public school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HousePublic Law 174
2019-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 530: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-04-15HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 428: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-08SenateAmendment #1 (Spartz) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateSenator Raatz added as second sponsor
2019-03-19SenateSenator Spartz added as sponsor
2019-03-19SenateSenator Raatz removed as sponsor
2019-03-11SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Spartz
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseAmendment #3 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-04HouseAmendment #6 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Smith, V. added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Behning
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1400/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/5/c/545cc953/HB1400.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/8/d/dd8dae02/HB1400.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/0/c/b60cd2ae/HB1400.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/4/5/bf453ed0/HB1400.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/9/4/5894ab17/HB1400.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/3/3/2b337485/HB1400.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/f/e/0efec20f/HB1400.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/1/b/361b8691/HB1400.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/c/a/72cacbcb/HB1400.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/8/a/9f8a04d9/HB1400.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/c/7/69c74486/HB1400.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/6/8/1c68dd7d/HB1400.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/7/3/bf738c23/HB1400.111.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/d/1/71d12eed/HB1400.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/0/2/8b02cab2/HB1400.428.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/3/2/e3326012/HB1400.530.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback