IN HB1372 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Various election law matters. Provides that money received from civil penalties collected by a county election board may be used for any purpose relating to implementation of Indiana election law in the county. Increases from 1,200 to 2,000 the maximum number of active voters who may reside in a precinct. Provides that in a county that uses electronic poll books for absentee voting in the office of the circuit court clerk or at a satellite office, a voter is not required to file an absentee ballot application but is required only to sign the absentee ballot affidavit and the electronic

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various election law matters. Provides that money received from civil penalties collected by a county election board may be used for any purpose relating to implementation of Indiana election law in the county. Increases from 1,200 to 2,000 the maximum number of active voters who may reside in a precinct. Provides that in a county that uses electronic poll books for absentee voting in the office of the circuit court clerk or at a satellite office, a voter is not required to file an absentee ballot application but is required only to sign the absentee ballot affidavit and the electronic

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Elections
2015-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-17HouseRepresentatives GiaQuinta, Cox, Cook added as coauthors
2015-02-17HouseSenator Miller, Pete added as second sponsor
2015-02-17HouseSenator Walker added as sponsor
2015-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Richardson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback