IN HB1335 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various election law matters. Modifies the date associated with references in the election code to a federal statute or regulation. Removes and updates obsolete date references from Indiana election law. Specifies additional requirements for a certificate of ascertainment of presidential electors. Modifies the day of the week that presidential electors must assemble to elect the President and Vice President of the United States.
Title
Various election law matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Public Law 141 |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 400: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2023-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second sponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2023-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Wesco |