IN HB1300 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ordinances related to building and housing laws. Specifies that an ordinance or other regulation adopted by a political subdivision that qualifies as a fire safety law or a building law: (1) must be submitted to the fire prevention and building safety commission (commission) for review within 30 days of adoption by the political subdivision; and (2) is not effective until the ordinance or regulation: (A) is approved by the commission; or (B) is approved automatically if the commission does not approve or deny the ordinance or regulation within four commission meetings. Requires the commission to specify the basis for the
Title
Ordinances related to building and housing laws. Specifies that an ordinance or other regulation adopted by a political subdivision that qualifies as a fire safety law or a building law: (1) must be submitted to the fire prevention and building safety commission (commission) for review within 30 days of adoption by the political subdivision; and (2) is not effective until the ordinance or regulation: (A) is approved by the commission; or (B) is approved automatically if the commission does not approve or deny the ordinance or regulation within four commission meetings. Requires the commission to specify the basis for the
Sponsors
Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Boots) prevailed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Boots) prevailed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Public Law 101 |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 482: yeas 70, nays 17 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as third sponsor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 397: yeas 38, nays 11 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Boots) prevailed; Roll Call 353: yeas 37, nays 12 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Local Government |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Senator Boots added as sponsor |
2015-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 77, nays 19 |
2015-02-10 | House | Amendment #3 (Pryor) motion withdrawn |
2015-02-10 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin |
2015-01-13 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2015-01-13 | House | Representative Eberhart added as coauthor |