IN HB1275 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sepsis treatment guidelines. Requires a hospital to adopt, implement, and periodically update evidence based sepsis guidelines for the early recognition and treatment of patients with sepsis, severe sepsis, or septic shock that are based on generally accepted guidelines. Exempts certain hospitals. Establishes the sepsis treatment guideline task force (task force). Assigns the task force certain duties concerning evidence based sepsis guidelines, best practices, education materials, and appropriate data measures. Requires the state department of health to prepare a report on the implementation of the sepsis guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sepsis treatment guidelines. Requires a hospital to adopt, implement, and periodically update evidence based sepsis guidelines for the early recognition and treatment of patients with sepsis, severe sepsis, or septic shock that are based on generally accepted guidelines. Exempts certain hospitals. Establishes the sepsis treatment guideline task force (task force). Assigns the task force certain duties concerning evidence based sepsis guidelines, best practices, education materials, and appropriate data measures. Requires the state department of health to prepare a report on the implementation of the sepsis guidelines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 133
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 463: yeas 90, nays 3
2019-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseCosponsor: Senator Melton
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau, Ruckelshaus and Holdman
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseRepresentatives Barrett, Fleming, Hatfield added as coauthors
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Mahan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1275/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/7/2/477270aa/HB1275.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/9/e/419e9e98/HB1275.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/8/0/0980a35b/HB1275.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/1/8/2418eeec/HB1275.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/a/6/08a61b33/HB1275.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/e/d/00edfbb4/HB1275.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/b/8/46b88312/HB1275.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/4/1/d5411bc7/HB1275.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/a/0/c6a049be/HB1275.107.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/6/f/c36f4f5d/HB1275.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/7/e/187e143d/HB1275.326.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/e/a/4fea0f84/HB1275.463.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback