IN HB1250 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senator Simpson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Senator Simpson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers $1,500,000 of the amount appropriated to the Indiana economic development corporation (corporation) in the current biennium from the purposes specified in the budget bill enacted in the 2009 special session to the purposes of the capital access program. Provides for the state budget agency to identify, with the approval of the corporation, which previously appropriated amounts are reappropriated to the capital access program.
Title
Capital access program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | Senator Simpson added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-02 | Representative Murphy added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsor: Senator Paul | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 125: Yeas 98, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Representative Barnes added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Representative Reske added as coauthor | |
2010-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Small Business and Economic Development | |
2010-01-12 | Authored by Representative DeLaney |