IN HB1210 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana destination development corporation board. Adds a member to the Indiana destination development corporation board. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Indiana destination development corporation board.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Beau Baird [R] | Rep. Chris Campbell [D] |
Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. Kyle Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Public Law 69 |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senator Walker K added as second sponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Perfect |
2023-01-19 | House | Representative Campbell added as coauthor |
2023-01-19 | House | Representatives Bartels and Baird added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |