IN HB1193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study of injured public safety officer monument. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the construction of an injured public safety officer monument.
Title
Study of injured public safety officer monument. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the construction of an injured public safety officer monument.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Public Law 79 |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senators Doriot, Delph, Niemeyer, Mrvan, Melton added as cosponsors |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Sandlin |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Bartlett added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2018-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |