IN HB1168 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electric vehicles and advanced technology. Establishes the electric vehicle product commission.
Title
Electric vehicles and advanced technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Public Law 128 |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 383: yeas 88, nays 1 |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senators Garten, Doriot, Crane, Mrvan added as cosponsors |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senator Crider added as third sponsor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 45, nays 4 |
2021-03-25 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Garten) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Sullivan removed as coauthor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2021-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 106: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2021-02-08 | House | Representatives Manning and Sullivan added as coauthors |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative Hamilton |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |