IN HB1154 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the local Indiana business preference applies to a contract for a purchase made by a political subdivision only if the political subdivision provides in the solicitation that the preference is applicable to the purchase. Provides that the term "affected county" refers only to an Indiana county. Repeals the local Indiana business preference for public works projects.
Title
Local purchasing and public works preferences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Riecken), failed (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 14 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Amendment 1 (Riecken), failed (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-20 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2012-02-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 47 and nays 3 | |
2012-02-14 | Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed; Roll Call 192: yeas 14, nays 36 | |
2012-02-14 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Senator Paul added as second sponsor | |
2012-02-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2012-01-27 | Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 73, nays 18 | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment 1 (Riecken), failed; Roll Call 60: yeas 34, nays 58 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Messmer |