IN HB1117 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing facility Medicaid reimbursement rates. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to use the report card score published by the state department of health on June 30, 2017, to establish the nursing facility report card score measure of the nursing facility total quality score in determining reimbursement rates to nursing facilities for services provided to Medicaid recipients for the July 1, 2018, rate effective date.
Title
Nursing facility Medicaid reimbursement rates. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to use the report card score published by the state department of health on June 30, 2017, to establish the nursing facility report card score measure of the nursing facility total quality score in determining reimbursement rates to nursing facilities for services provided to Medicaid recipients for the July 1, 2018, rate effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] |
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 31 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senators Becker and Leising added as cosponsors |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2018-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Representative Eberhart added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Shackleford added as coauthor |
2018-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell |