IN HB1087 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Payment of court costs. Allows a court to reduce some or all of the court costs owed by a person who performs community service or approved uncompensated volunteer work by: (1) determining the number of hours of community service or volunteer work performed by the person; (2) multiplying the number of hours worked by the Indiana minimum wage; and (3) deducting that figure from the amount owed. Excludes from the calculation community service hours required to be performed under a plea agreement.
Title
Payment of court costs. Allows a court to reduce some or all of the court costs owed by a person who performs community service or approved uncompensated volunteer work by: (1) determining the number of hours of community service or volunteer work performed by the person; (2) multiplying the number of hours worked by the Indiana minimum wage; and (3) deducting that figure from the amount owed. Excludes from the calculation community service hours required to be performed under a plea agreement.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. Ryan Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Public Law 77 |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 406: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 284: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-01-17 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bohacek |
2019-01-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-03 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara, Heaton and Hatfield |
2019-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Pressel |