IN HB1064 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds ammonium chloride, potassium iodide, and calcium chloride to the list of chemical reagents and precursors for purposes of criminal laws concerning unlawful possession or sale of chemical reagents or precursors.
Title
Chemical reagents and precursors.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Kubacki [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2013-01-23 | House | Representatives McNamara and Pierce added as coauthors |
2013-01-23 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Becker |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2013-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2013-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Smaltz and Kubacki |
2013-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |