IN HB1040 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if: (1) a county adopts an ordinance approving the provision of community fast responder services; and (2) the nonprofit corporation directing the provision of community fast responder services maintains a certain level of insurance; the liability of a community fast responder is limited to the amount of insurance. Provides that a community fast responder nonprofit corporation does not include a hospital or an entity operated or directed by a hospital. Provides that fast responders have the same immunity from liability as first responders. Requires a community fast responder nonprofit corporation to purchase an insurance policy that provides $700,000 of insurance coverage for the liability of the corporation's community fast responders. Provides that the limit of liability of a community fast responder nonprofit corporation is $5,000,000. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Immunity for fast responders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 326: yeas 49, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 363: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-07 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisors appointed: Bray, R. Young and Head | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Miller and Hume | |
2012-03-01 | House advisors appointed: R. Frye, Borders, Moseley and White | |
2012-03-01 | House conferees appointed: T. Brown and Grubb | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Senator Steele added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2012-01-25 | Representative R. Frye added as coauthor | |
2012-01-17 | Senate sponsor: Senator Miller | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-17 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-01-13 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representative T. Brown | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Grubb |