IN HB1034 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that if the total value of property claimed as exempt by a bankruptcy debtor with respect to certain specified categories of property is less than the sum of the maximum allowed exemption values for those categories, the debtor may apportion among the specified categories an amount equal to the difference between the sum of the maximum allowed exemption values and the total amount claimed as exempt, notwithstanding the applicable maximum exemption value for each category. Provides that the total amount of intangible personal property that may be claimed as exempt by a debtor may not exceed $10,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bankruptcy exemptions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2010-01-20 Senate sponsors: Senators Dillon, Tallian and Bray
2010-01-20 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: Yeas 65, Nays 30
2010-01-19 Amendment 2 (DeLaney), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-19 Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Placed back on second reading
2010-01-12 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-07 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
2010-01-05 Coauthored by Representatives Burton, Bardon and Foley
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative DeLaney

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback