IN HB1021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a school corporation may determine the allocation among its funds of property tax reductions resulting from the granting of property tax circuit breaker credits.
Title
Protected taxes and school corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 138801 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 138801 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Errington |