IL SR1719 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass legislation to allocate funds from the Interim Storage Fund to the local authorities in Zion and other similarly situated communities to mitigate social and economic impacts arising from the storage of nuclear material.
Title
INTERIM STORAGE FUND - ZION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Be Adopted Energy and Public Utilities; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |