IL SR1325 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States the belief that the Illinois Income Tax Act should not be amended to permit taxing retirement income.
Title
NO TAXES ON RETIREMENT INCOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-02-18 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (RV) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1325&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SR/09900SR1325.htm |