IL SR0770 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 9, 2024 as Race Amity Day.
Title
RACE AMITY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Rights; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Human Rights |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=770&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0770.htm |