IL SR0271 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 28, 2019 as Celebrating Women in Public Office Day.
Title
WOMEN IN PUBLIC OFFICE DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=271&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0271.htm |