IL SR0094 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges a full bipartisan investigation by Congress and supports the call for a National Intelligence Estimate (NIE) to determine the extent of Russian intervention in the 2016 United States presidential election.
Title
U.S. ELECTION - RUSSIA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=94&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0094.htm |