IL SR0066 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares July 16, 2023 as Atomic Veterans Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
ATOMIC VETERANS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Be Adopted Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=66&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0066.htm |