IL SJRCA0017 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that individual income taxes may be at a graduated or a non-graduated rate. Provides that any such tax imposed on corporations shall be at a non-graduated rate, not to exceed the average of the lowest and highest individual rates by more than a ratio of 8 to 5. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-GRADUATED INC TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=17&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SJRCA/09800SC0017.htm |