IL SJR0028 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois Route 121 as it runs from the Macon/Moultrie County line to the intersection of Route 121 and Route 36 in Decatur as the "Trooper Todd Hanneken Memorial Highway".
Title
TROOPER HANNEKEN HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Sen. Steve McClure [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2023-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2023-05-24 | House | Resolution Adopted 101-000-000 |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 010-000-000 |
2023-05-24 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 004-000-000 |
2023-05-24 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-05-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-05-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |