IL SB3722 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection of Unprotected Area Act. Provides that all unprotected areas of unincorporated portions of a county (instead of a county of less than 500,000 inhabitants) shall be eligible for assignment by the State Fire Marshal of fire protection coverage from a fire protection jurisdiction. Changes "fire protection district" to "fire protection jurisdiction". Provides that a "fire protection jurisdiction" includes fire departments of any unit of local government. Adds that property owners of an unprotected area may request that the State Fire Marshal arrange for fire protection coverage for the unprotected area from specified fire protection jurisdictions. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE MARSHAL-UNPROTECTED AREAS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1177 | |
2010-07-22 | Effective Date July 22, 2010 | |
2010-07-22 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2010-05-06 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-06 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-005-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass / Short Debate Fire Protection; 005-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Fire Protection | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Frerichs | |
2010-03-17 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |