IL SB3479 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that blood testing materials purchased for use by persons residing in certain licensed facilities are exempt from the taxes imposed under those Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-BLOOD TESTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-01-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-12-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-12-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-12-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-12-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-12-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-004-000 |
2012-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-05-24 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 002-001-000 |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-05-04 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012 |
2012-04-19 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2012-04-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2012-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |