IL SB3456 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Creates a winery special use license. Provides that a winery special use license shall allow an Illinois first-class or second-class wine-maker or a first class or second class wine-manufacturer to transfer some of its wine inventory from its licensed premises to the premises specified in the local liquor authority license for sale at retail only at premises specified in the local authority license and only for the dates and times specified. Provides that a winery special use license shall be granted for a period not to exceed 12 months and may be renewed annually, provided that the applicant submits proof satisfactory to the State Commission that the applicant will provide dram shop liability insurance to the maximum limits and will obtain local authority approval. Provides that a winery special use licensee shall only sell its own manufactured wine.
Title
LIQUOR-SPECIAL USE PERMIT LIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-12-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-12-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-12-04 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-12-04 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-12-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-12-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-12-03 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-12-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-11-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-04-19 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tom Cross |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2012-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-04-17 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-03-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Frerichs |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Held in Executive |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |