IL SB3328 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall, immediately upon passage of this amendatory Act of the 98th General Assembly, suspend acceptance or approval of any and all new permits for high volume horizontal fracturing operations or horizontal drilling with fracturing operations in any and all of the geographic areas in the 9-county area situated over or located above the Mahomet aquifer in this State. Provides that the Department shall work with the Illinois State Geological Survey and the Mahomet Aquifer Consortium to determine exact map locations of all areas in this State that are situated over or located above the Mahomet aquifer. Creates the Mahomet Aquifer Task Force to investigate any and all adverse effects of high volume hydraulic fracturing operations or horizontal drilling with fracturing operations. Requires the Task Force to report to the General Assembly and the Governor on its findings.
Title
FRACKING-MAHOMET AQUIFER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |