IL SB3320 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that any fund that received less than $100,000 but more than $90,000 by October 1, 2011 shall also be included on the individual income tax form for the taxable year beginning on January 1, 2012. Provides that, if a fund that received less than $100,000 but more than $90,000 by October 1, 2011 does not receive at least $100,000 in contributions by October 1, 2013, or by October 1 of any subsequent year, then the fund shall be removed from the individual income tax return forms for each year following the year in which the fund did not receive at least $100,000, and all subsequent contributions to the fund shall be refunded to the taxpayer. Effective immediately.
Title
TAX CHECKOFFS-MIN CONTRIB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1117 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2012 |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 031-016-003 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 031-016-003 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-003-000 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Postponed Revenue |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed Revenue |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2012-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2012 |
2012-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2012-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-015-000 |
2012-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2012-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2012-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2012-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-003-000 |
2012-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-05-24 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2012-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2012 |
2012-05-04 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2012-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2012-04-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-03-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2012-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2012 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 509.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |