IL SB3299 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that when notification is made to a lessor by a governmental agency of an act under the Section concerning leased premises used in furtherance of a criminal offense, the governmental agencies having jurisdiction over the leased premises shall provide the owner, lessor, or agent with the information reasonably necessary to substantiate the required elements of a forcible entry and detainer action. Provides that a municipality or other governmental entity may not require an owner, lessor, or agent to bring a forcible entry and detainer action or impose a penalty on the owner, lessor, or agent for failure to evict when notification is made.
Title
CIV PRO-LEASES:CRIM ACTIVITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |