IL SB3196 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that no later than January 1, 2010, the Department of Public Health shall designate one or more facilities or a distinct segregated area of a facility for individuals needing intermediate or skilled care services, but who have been determined to need more intense supervision than the standard nursing home care can provide, including individuals with sex offense convictions, ex-felons identified as high risk during their risk assessment, parolees identified by the Department of Corrections as high risk, and residents of nursing homes determined to be at risk of harming themselves or another for whom no alternative placement can be found. Requires the Department to form a work group to develop criteria for admission to a high risk facility or unit, as well as security standards. Provides that members of the work group shall include the Directors of all agencies having expertise in high risk individuals, such as the Directors of the Departments of Corrections and State Police, representatives of associations representing long-term care facilities, and individuals representing the interests of nursing home residents. Requires the Department to issue an evaluation of the initiative no later than January 1, 2015. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSNG HOME-HIGH RISK FACILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Public Health Subcommittee on Nursing Home Care | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado | |
2010-02-23 | To Public Health Subcommittee on Nursing Home Care | |
2010-02-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3196&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB3196.htm |