IL SB2841 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning coverage for mammograms, provides that coverage shall also include a diagnostic mammogram when medically necessary, as determined by a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches, advanced practice registered nurse, or physician assistant. Makes changes to coverage for a comprehensive ultrasound screening and MRI. Effective immediately.
Title
INSURANCE-DIAGNOSTIC MAMMOGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | 4-6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2841&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2841.htm |