IL SB2841 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Recreational Trails of Illinois Act. Provides that any person under the age of 18 who is operating an off-highway vehicle on public land, shall be trained and certified through a State-approved off-highway vehicle safety course. Provides that the minimum age to operate an off-highway vehicle on public land shall be 14 years old, and that any person under the age of 16 is prohibited from operating an off-highway vehicle on public land without direct adult supervision. Provides that unless the off-highway vehicle was designed by the manufacturer to carry a passenger, it shall be unlawful for a passenger to be on an off-highway vehicle on public land. Provides that any person operating an off-highway vehicle on public lands is required to wear a safety helmet and eye protection and the off-highway vehicle operated on public land shall have a headlight and tail light illuminated at night, brakes, a muffler, and a spark arrestor.
Title
ATV REGULATION AND SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 862 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 862 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2841&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2841.htm |