IL SB2596 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act must provide coverage for medically necessary preventative physical or rehabilitative therapy for insureds diagnosed with multiple sclerosis without any treatment limitation or calendar year maximum as determined by the patient's treating physician. Makes changes to the provision's definition of "preventative physical therapy" to include physical and other rehabilitative therapy. Removes requirements that coverage under this provision be subject to the same coinsurance, waiting period, cost sharing limitation, treatment limitation, calendar year maximum, or other limitation as provided for other physical or rehabilitative therapy benefits.
Title
INS CD-MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-05-17 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-05-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |