IL SB2585 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that permanent vehicle registration plates shall be issued to vehicles owned and used by the Illinois State Police at no charge. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-REG PLATES-IL ST POLICE
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0590 |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Effective Date June 8, 2018 |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bivins |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-808.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |