IL SB2325 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, Service Use Tax Act, Service Occupation Tax Act, and Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Imposes an 18% surcharge on firearms and firearm ammunition. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Firearm Sales Tax Trust Fund. Requires the 18% surcharge to be deposited into the Fund. Subject to appropriation, authorizes the Department of Human Services to make grants to mental health services and crime victim services. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act (FOID). Requires firearm safety training to apply for an FOID Card, but exempts anyone who had an FOID card on June 1, 1998 and certain others. Provides that any person who owns a firearm shall maintain a policy of liability insurance in the amount of at least $1,000,000 specifically covering any damages resulting from negligent or willful acts involving the use of the firearm. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Prohibits multiple sales of firearms within a 30-day period. Creates the offense of unlawful acquisition of firearms. Provides exemptions and affirmative defenses. Penalty is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Increases the penalty for a second or subsequent unlawful use of weapons for possession of a firearm. Increases various penalties for the possession or use of a firearm or weapon in a school or public housing. Prohibits a person not a law enforcement officer from possessing an air rifle in a school or at a school-related activity without the written authorization of the board or officer in charge of the school. Penalty is a Class A misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC/CRIM CD FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.826 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 4.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 65 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3.1A | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24.8-2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 24.8-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2325&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2325.htm |