IL SB2260 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Requires lobbyists to file with the Secretary of State a written statement that describes the procedures that the lobbyist and lobbyist's client will follow if the lobbyist or client determines that the lobbyist's representation of the client creates a conflict of interest. Prohibits a lobbyist from representing a client if the representation involves a conflict of interest, unless otherwise provided in the agreement between the lobbyist and the party he or she represents.
Title
LOBBYIST-CONFLICT REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2260&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2260.htm |