IL SB2065 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. With respect to benefits paid to certain academic personnel beginning on or after January 3, 2021 and before September 4, 2021, provides that: (i) an employer that is subject to the payment of contributions shall not be chargeable for any benefit charges; (ii) a nonprofit organization that is subject to making payments in lieu of contributions shall be chargeable for 50% of the benefits paid if the week begins before April 4, 2021, and 75% if the week begins on or after April 4, 2021; and (iii) the State and any local government that is subject to making payments in lieu of contributions shall be chargeable for 50% of the benefits paid if the week begins before April 4, 2021, and 75% if the week begins on or after April 4, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
IHDA-OUTSTANDING BONDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0666 |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Effective Date October 8, 2021 |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-08-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2021-08-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-08-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-08-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2021-08-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-08-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-08-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2021-08-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-08-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-08-31 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-08-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-08-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-08-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-08-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-08-31 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-06-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-06-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3805 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |