IL SB2047 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a health insurer that provides prescription drug benefits shall offer generic alternatives to brand name epinephrine and insulin auto-injectors, where available. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-AUTO INJECTORS
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] |
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-18 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |