IL SB1560 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Campus Free Expression Act. Deems the outdoor areas of campuses of institutions of higher education (both private and public) as traditional public forums. Provides that institutions of higher education may maintain and enforce reasonable time, place, and manner restrictions in service of a significant institutional interest only when such restrictions employ clear, published, content-neutral, and viewpoint-neutral criteria and provide for ample alternative means of expression, with any such restrictions allowing for members of the higher education community to spontaneously and contemporaneously assemble. Provides that any person who wishes to engage in noncommercial, expressive activity on campus shall be permitted to do so freely, as long as the person's conduct is not unlawful (subject to an institution's restrictions). Contains enforcement provisions. Amends the Campus Demonstrations Policy Act to make a corresponding change. Effective immediately.
Title
CAMPUS FREE EXPRESSION
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1560&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1560.htm |