IL SB1445 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a license requirement.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 9 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |