IL SB1422 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0585
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0585
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Savings Bank Act. Changes the definition of "control" to include certain persons or entities that engage in specific activities that have 10% or more of the capital stock or members shares of a mutual savings bank or mutual savings bank holding company. Provides that no person, whether acting directly or indirectly or through or in concert with one or more persons, may acquire control of a savings bank operating under the Act without prior approval of the Commissioner of Banks and Real Estate. Specifies the activities that the Commissioner may engage in with respect to investigating or approving the change in control of a savings bank. Provides that the Commissioner may prohibit participation in the affairs of any savings bank by any current, former, or prospective officer, director, employee, or agent of a savings bank, if he or she finds that the person or persons engages in specified activities. Provides that "institution affiliated party" includes a person who has filed or is required to file a change-in-control application (instead of change-in-control notice) with the Commissioner. Effective immediately.
Title
SAVINGS BANK-CHANGE IN CONTROL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-18 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0585 | |
2009-08-18 | Effective Date August 18, 2009 | |
2009-08-18 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-22 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 014-006-001 | |
2009-04-20 | Re-assigned to Financial Institutions Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. James D. Brosnahan | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Financial Institutions | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |