IL SB1360 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Assumed Business Name Act. Provides that filings under the Act shall be in the manner prescribed by the County Clerk. Provides for the renewal of assumed business names every 5 years in counties with a population of 4,000,000 or more inhabitants.
Title
ASSUMED BUSINESS NAME RENEWAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-03 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-036-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 010-001-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-014-000 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 405 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |