IL SB1304 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of criminal damage to a critical infrastructure facility for a person who knowingly damages, destroys, vandalizes, defaces, or tampers with equipment in a critical infrastructure facility. Provides the penalty is a Class 1 felony punishable by a fine of $100,000, imprisonment, or both. Expands the offense of criminal trespass to a nuclear facility to include other critical infrastructure facilities. Provides the penalty is a Class 4 felony punishable by a fine of not less than $1,000, imprisonment, or both. Creates the offense of aggravated criminal trespass to a critical infrastructure facility for a person who commits a criminal trespass to a critical infrastructure facility with the intent to damage, destroy, vandalize, deface, or tamper with equipment of the facility, or impede or inhibit operations of the facility. Provides the penalty is a Class 3 felony punishable by a fine of not less than $10,000, imprisonment, or both. Provides if a business, corporation, or organization is convicted of conspiracy to commit any of the offenses the entity shall, in addition to any other applicable penalty, be sentenced to a fine of not less than 10 times the minimum fine authorized for the offense. Provides a person may be liable in any civil action for money damages to the owner of the critical infrastructure facility for any damage to personal or real property of the facility resulting from any of the offenses, and that a person may also be liable to the owner for court costs and reasonable attorney's fees. Provides for exemptions. Defines "critical infrastructure facility".
Title
CRIM CD-CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTUR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 2-5.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 21-1.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 21-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1304&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1304.htm |