IL SB0780 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that it shall be lawful for any person who holds the licenses, permits, and stamps required for the taking of migratory waterfowl to use steel and other non-toxic shotshells as approved by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service when taking waterfowl at any location in the State where the hunting of migratory waterfowl is authorized. Provides that it is unlawful to use any shotgun larger than 10 gauge or smaller than a .410 bore to take species protected by this Act; however, nothing shall prohibit the use of a shotgun, not larger than 10 gauge nor smaller than a 20 gauge, with a rifled barrel. Provides that it shall be unlawful to use lead shotshells to take wildlife on Department of Natural Resources properties on or after January 1, 2022. Makes other changes.
Title
WILDLIFE-MIGRATORY WATERFOWL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |