IL SB0259 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Allows a court to order the relocation of a child on a temporary basis before the entry of a final allocation judgment if it is in the best interests of the child. Provides that a temporary relocation shall not prejudice either parent in the allocation of parental responsibilities contained in a final allocation judgment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-CHILDREN-RELOCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0143
2021-07-23SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-07-23SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-001
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-05-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-17HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505603.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback