IL HR1226 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November of 2016 as COPD awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
COPD AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-06-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-06-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-05-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1226&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1226.htm |