IL HR1092 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to immediately adopt an "American Recovery" program by restoring the provisions of the Glass Steagall Act; returning to a national banking and a federal credit system, modeled on the principles of Alexander Hamilton's First Bank of the United States; using the federal credit system to build a modern network of high speed rail, power generating systems, and water projects; and creating programs to rebuild our space program to put a permanent manned colony on the Moon, explore the solar system, and create nuclear fusion.
Title
AMERICAN RECOVERY PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-06-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-04-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 005-004-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1092&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1092.htm |